LA SB146 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date 11/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date 11/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Habitual Offender Law. (11/1/17)
Title
Provides relative to the Habitual Offender Law. (11/1/17)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146 CONCUR (#763) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#666) (Y: 68 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#306) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#271) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#666) (Y: 68 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#306) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#271) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Effective date 11/1/2017. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 257. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 17. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-05-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 12 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 15 nays. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |