LA SB152 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 10/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for truth in labeling requirements of agricultural products. (10/1/20)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for truth in labeling requirements of agricultural products. (10/1/20)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 152 CONCUR (#928) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 152 REJECT (#927) (Y: 9 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 152 FINAL PASSAGE (#849) (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 152 FINAL PASSAGE (#849) (Y: 60 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 152 FINAL PASSAGE (#90) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateEffective date 10/1/2020.
2019-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 273.
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-05SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 7 nays.
2019-06-03SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-06-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 29. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-31HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-30HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-04-23HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-22SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB152&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120911
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124870
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126088
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142580
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144034
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124815
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125203
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136742
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140099
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141799
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120912
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125596
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126190
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145129
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126021
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141763
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142097
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142308
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142309

Bill Comments

feedback