LA SB158 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the creation of local special education advisory councils. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the creation of local special education advisory councils. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 158 CONCUR (#929) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 158 FINAL PASSAGE (#827) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 158 FINAL PASSAGE (#363) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 158 FINAL PASSAGE (#827) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 158 FINAL PASSAGE (#363) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2019. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 274. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-05-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |