LA SB160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 240.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 240.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to programs and professional training to fight the opioid crisis. (8/1/19)
Title
Provides relative to programs and professional training to fight the opioid crisis. (8/1/19)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 240. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported by substitute. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |