LA SB163 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to extend special assessment for, and exemptions for disabled veterans and their spouses, and for surviving spouses of military personnel, law enforcement and fire protection officers, and first responders from, ad valorem tax purposes on homesteads to apply to persons with usufruct when naked ownership is in trust. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to extend special assessment for, and exemptions for disabled veterans and their spouses, and for surviving spouses of military personnel, law enforcement and fire protection officers, and first responders from, ad valorem tax purposes on homesteads to apply to persons with usufruct when naked ownership is in trust. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 CONCUR (#1260) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#1186) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#1186) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 163 FINAL PASSAGE (#293) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Becomes Act No. 721 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |