LA SB218 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 1/15/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 1/15/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that completion of qualifying forms for elected office include submission of valid identification. (1/15/21)
Title
Requires that completion of qualifying forms for elected office include submission of valid identification. (1/15/21)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 218 ADOPT (#721) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 218 MOTION TO ADOPT (#772) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 218 REJECT (#651) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 218 FINAL PASSAGE (#592) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 218 FINAL PASSAGE (#172) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 218 MOTION TO ADOPT (#772) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 218 REJECT (#651) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 218 FINAL PASSAGE (#592) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 218 FINAL PASSAGE (#172) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Senate | Effective date 1/15/2021. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 312. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2020-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2020-06-01 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2020-06-01 | House | House conferees appointed: Horton, Dwight, and Seabaugh. |
2020-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Cloud, Hewitt, and Price. |
2020-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-27 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |