LA SB225 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date 1/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date 1/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to release and cancellation of mortgages.
Title
Provides relative to release and cancellation of mortgages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225, CONCUR (#875) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Vote on SB 225, FINAL PASSAGE (#697) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225, FINAL PASSAGE (#453) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Vote on SB 225, FINAL PASSAGE (#697) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225, FINAL PASSAGE (#453) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Effective date 1/1/12. | |
2011-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 342. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-19 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-16 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-16 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2011. | |
2011-06-15 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-13 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2011-06-09 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-06-09 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-06-08 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-08 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-06 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-06-01 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-31 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary A. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary A. |