LA SB240 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the provision of medication-assisted treatment (MAT). (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the provision of medication-assisted treatment (MAT). (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 240 FINAL PASSAGE (#666) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 240 FINAL PASSAGE (#270) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateEffective date 8/1/2019.
2019-06-20SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 414.
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-29SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-16HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-07HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-07SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-06SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-02SenateSubstitute for Senate Bill No. 160. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback