LA SB273 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for registration with secretary of state by managed service providers servicing public bodies. (See Act) (EN +$48,000 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for registration with secretary of state by managed service providers servicing public bodies. (See Act) (EN +$48,000 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 273 CONCUR (#435) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 273 FINAL PASSAGE (#459) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 273 FINAL PASSAGE (#175) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateEffective date: See Act.
2020-06-09SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 117.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-05-31HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-28SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-27HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-27HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-18HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-05-13SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB273&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162165
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170006
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172048
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177221
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181344
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169013
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171577
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173429
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173444
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174850
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176422
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176673
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176689
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162169
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169320
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170537
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170799
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172228
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172414
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173590
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177469
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180117
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171983
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177125

Bill Comments

feedback