LA SB31 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to provide for disqualification from seeking or holding an elective office. (2/3-CA13sl(A))
Title
Constitutional amendment to provide for disqualification from seeking or holding an elective office. (2/3-CA13sl(A))
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 CONCUR (#1331) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#1330) (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#1185) (Y: 64 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#497) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#1330) (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#1185) (Y: 64 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#497) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Becomes Act No. 719 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 16. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |