LA SB359 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-22 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 32, nays 59. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-22 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 32, nays 59. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for selection or rejection of uninsured motorist coverage pursuant to the Louisiana Uniform Electronic Transactions Act. (8/1/12)
Title
Provides for selection or rejection of uninsured motorist coverage pursuant to the Louisiana Uniform Electronic Transactions Act. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 359, FINAL PASSAGE (#1052) (Y: 33 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 359, FINAL PASSAGE (#103) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 359, FINAL PASSAGE (#103) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 32, nays 59. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-22 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2012. | |
2012-05-07 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-03 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-02 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2012-03-27 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-03-26 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-21 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-20 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |