LA SB359 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the enforcement of coastal use permits. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the enforcement of coastal use permits. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-19SenateRead by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-19SenateReported favorably.
2020-05-18SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-14SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 5/18.
2020-05-14SenateRules suspended.
2020-05-11SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback