LA SB491 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limits liability of persons who provide relief or recovery equipment or services during a declared state emergency. (gov sig)
Title
Limits liability of persons who provide relief or recovery equipment or services during a declared state emergency. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 491 FINAL PASSAGE (#555) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 491 FINAL PASSAGE (#194) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 491 FINAL PASSAGE (#194) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2020. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 303. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-26 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported favorably (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |