LA SB79 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to authorize ad valorem tax exemptions in Orleans Parish to promote affordable housing. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (EN DECREASE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to authorize ad valorem tax exemptions in Orleans Parish to promote affordable housing. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (EN DECREASE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#815) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 CO-AUTHORS (#275) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#274) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#205) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateEffective date: See Act.
2019-06-28SenateBecomes Act No. 448
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-04SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-06-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19.
2019-05-30HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-29HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-28HouseReported without amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-05-20HouseReported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-05-09HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-05-09HouseDischarged from the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-05-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-05-08HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-07SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 9 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-07SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-05-02SenateReconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-05-01SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title. By a vote of 22 yeas and 13 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-03-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB79&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118914
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128563
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132196
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141588
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145437
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130252
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118915
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124014
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129316
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129682
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132333
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133164
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142407
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145439
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129807
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132137
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141460

Bill Comments

feedback