LA SB91 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to electric low-speed scooters. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to electric low-speed scooters. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 91 CONCUR (#660) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 91 FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 91 FINAL PASSAGE (#112) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateEffective date 7/1/2019.
2019-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 258.
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-05-30SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-20HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-24HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-23SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-17SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB91&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119531
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125432
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126722
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140576
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144056
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125007
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126442
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135269
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135618
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139542
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140043
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119532
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126129
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126804
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135656
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143843
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126646
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139716
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140448

Bill Comments

feedback