LA SCR11 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests certain state agencies and private businesses in Louisiana to recognize the value that justice-involved persons can bring to the workforce and society and to act with intention to empower, train, and employ such individuals.
Title
Requests certain state agencies and private businesses in Louisiana to recognize the value that justice-involved persons can bring to the workforce and society and to act with intention to empower, train, and employ such individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11 CONCUR (#170) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 11 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#155) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11 ADOPT (#71) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 11 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#155) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11 ADOPT (#71) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 100 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-06-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/29/20. |
2020-06-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2020-06-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-06-23 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2020-06-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |