LA SCR111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to reassess the entire levee and floodwall system in the southeastern United States.
Title
Memorializes Congress to reassess the entire levee and floodwall system in the southeastern United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 111 ADOPT (#613) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-05-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |