LA SCR128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses condolences upon the death of Grace Elizabeth Gonsoulin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses condolences upon the death of Grace Elizabeth Gonsoulin.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 128 ADOPT (#586) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/30/2019.
2019-05-30SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-30HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2019-05-30HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2019-05-30SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback