LA SCR13 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Court Appointed Special Advocate (CASA) programs and volunteers for their outstanding work on behalf of the abused and neglected children and designates April 17, 2019, as CASA Day at the Legislature.
Title
Commends the Louisiana Court Appointed Special Advocate (CASA) programs and volunteers for their outstanding work on behalf of the abused and neglected children and designates April 17, 2019, as CASA Day at the Legislature.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R] | Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 13 ADOPT (#20) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019. |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-04-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |