LA SCR27 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Louisiana Department of Health to seek independent consultant opinions and alternative options for the submission of the Managed Care Section 438.6(c) Preprint to CMS for FY22 prior to finalization.
Title
Directs the Louisiana Department of Health to seek independent consultant opinions and alternative options for the submission of the Managed Care Section 438.6(c) Preprint to CMS for FY22 prior to finalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on SCR 27 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#174) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 CO-AUTHORS (#111) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 ADOPT (#110) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 CO-AUTHORS (#111) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 ADOPT (#110) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-06-30 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-06-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/30/20. |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-29 | House | Reported favorably (22-0). |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-06-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |