LA SCR32 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the service and contributions of first responders in Louisiana and designates April 30, 2019, as First Responders Appreciation Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Commends the service and contributions of first responders in Louisiana and designates April 30, 2019, as First Responders Appreciation Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 ADOPT (#99) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 CO-AUTHORS (#98) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 CO-AUTHORS (#98) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-04-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |