LA SCR34 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to consider eliminating the Windfall Elimination Provision (WEP) and the Government Pension Offset (GPO) Social Security benefit reductions.
Title
Memorializes Congress to consider eliminating the Windfall Elimination Provision (WEP) and the Government Pension Offset (GPO) Social Security benefit reductions.
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34 ADOPT (#46) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-04-17 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |