LA SCR36 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to support the #fixappratings initiative to deter children from downloading electronic applications (apps) that are harmful to minors.
Title
Memorializes Congress to support the #fixappratings initiative to deter children from downloading electronic applications (apps) that are harmful to minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 36 ADOPT (#355) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019. |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |