LA SCR38 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 11, 2019, as Louisiana Firefighters' Appreciation Day and commends all firefighters across the state for their dedication to public safety and for their service to the citizens of Louisiana and the United States of America.
Title
Recognizes May 11, 2019, as Louisiana Firefighters' Appreciation Day and commends all firefighters across the state for their dedication to public safety and for their service to the citizens of Louisiana and the United States of America.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 38 ADOPT (#65) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-04-17 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |