LA SCR39 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-19)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-19)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the Centennial Anniversary of the ratification of the 19th Amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Title
Recognizes the Centennial Anniversary of the ratification of the 19th Amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 39 ADOPT (#122) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019. |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |