LA SCR53 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Passed on May 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Passed on May 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences on the death of former Louisiana House of Representatives and Senate member, the Honorable Dudley Anthony "Butch" Gautreaux Jr.
Title
Expresses condolences on the death of former Louisiana House of Representatives and Senate member, the Honorable Dudley Anthony "Butch" Gautreaux Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 53 ADOPT (#73) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |