LA SCR54 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to maintain funding to the Corporation for National and Community Service and its programs, including the LaVetCorps.
Title
Memorializes Congress to maintain funding to the Corporation for National and Community Service and its programs, including the LaVetCorps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 54 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#617) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |