LA SCR55 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Closed Party Primary Task Force to study the necessary steps to develop a closed party primary election system applicable at the federal, state, and local levels beginning with the 2022 congressional elections.
Title
Establishes the Closed Party Primary Task Force to study the necessary steps to develop a closed party primary election system applicable at the federal, state, and local levels beginning with the 2022 congressional elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 55 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#629) (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 55 ADOPT (#219) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 55 ADOPT (#219) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 73 yeas, 19 nays. |
2020-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (10-0-1). |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |