LA SCR56 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Children and Family Services to create the "Task Force on Protecting Children from Exposure to Pornography".
Title
Requests the Department of Children and Family Services to create the "Task Force on Protecting Children from Exposure to Pornography".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 56 CONCUR (#921) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 56 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#859) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 56 ADOPT (#285) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 56 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#859) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 56 ADOPT (#285) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |