LA SCR62 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to implement a traumatic injury response program in all public schools.
Title
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to implement a traumatic injury response program in all public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 62 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#630) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 62 CO-AUTHORS (#313) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 62 ADOPT (#312) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 62 CO-AUTHORS (#313) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 62 ADOPT (#312) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2020-05-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-05-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |