LA SCR68 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the executive branch agencies under jurisdictional oversight of the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget to continue to submit statutorily mandated reports until such time as the mandate is specifically amended or repealed.
Title
Directs the executive branch agencies under jurisdictional oversight of the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget to continue to submit statutorily mandated reports until such time as the mandate is specifically amended or repealed.
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 68 ADOPT (#329) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-05-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |