LA SCR84 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to take all steps necessary to approve peer support services as a Medicaid covered service.
Title
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to take all steps necessary to approve peer support services as a Medicaid covered service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 84 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#862) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 84 ADOPT (#332) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 84 ADOPT (#332) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 1 nays. |
2019-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-14 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |