LA SR18 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To recognize and commemorate the historical significance of June 19,1865, as a day of celebration and recognition for the need to get along and work together.
Title
To recognize and commemorate the historical significance of June 19,1865, as a day of celebration and recognition for the need to get along and work together.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 18 CO-AUTHORS (#63) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted. |