LA SR225 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Thomas Lovince for his more than thirty years of state service, particularly for his leadership and determination in re-establishing Delgado Sidney Collier, an essential institution of higher learning following the catastrophic damage sustained by the campus as a result of Hurricane Katrina.
Title
Commends Thomas Lovince for his more than thirty years of state service, particularly for his leadership and determination in re-establishing Delgado Sidney Collier, an essential institution of higher learning following the catastrophic damage sustained by the campus as a result of Hurricane Katrina.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2019. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |