LA SR3 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/2/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/2/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences of the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana upon the death of James Michell "Jimmy" Bernhard.
Title
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences of the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana upon the death of James Michell "Jimmy" Bernhard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 3 CO-AUTHOR (#6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/2/2020. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |