LA SR36 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Senate Committee on Judiciary A to study the advisability of creating a statewide business court.
Title
Requests the Senate Committee on Judiciary A to study the advisability of creating a statewide business court.
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |