LA SR5 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a roll call vote to adopt a resolution introduced on the last day of a legislative session.
Title
Requires a roll call vote to adopt a resolution introduced on the last day of a legislative session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 5 ADOPT (#88) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | By a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |