LA SR5 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/2/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/2/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences on the death of Philip and Pauline Ackel.
Title
Expresses condolences on the death of Philip and Pauline Ackel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/2/2020. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |