LA SR57 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the executive branch agencies under the jurisdictional oversight of the Senate Committee on Retirement to continue to submit statutorily mandated reports until such time as the mandate is specifically amended or repealed.
Title
Directs the executive branch agencies under the jurisdictional oversight of the Senate Committee on Retirement to continue to submit statutorily mandated reports until such time as the mandate is specifically amended or repealed.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Price [D] | Sen. Cleo Fields [D] | Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R] | Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |