MA H1010 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to mutual company dividends. Financial Services.
Title
Relating to mutual company dividends
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3181 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H879 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
H1049 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - New draft substituted, see H4176
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4176 (Similar To) 2020-02-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2020
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H879 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
H1049 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - New draft substituted, see H4176
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4176 (Similar To) 2020-02-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2020
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1010 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1010.pdf |