MA H1014 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring that association health plans be subject to minimum credible coverage standards and Division of Insurance review and approval requirements. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to association health plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S722 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1014 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1014.pdf |