MA H1035 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make changes to certain references in banking laws. Financial Services.
Title
Making changes to certain references in the banking laws of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. John Lawn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H927 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2679 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2679 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1035 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1035.pdf |