MA H1148 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Driscoll of Milton, a petition of William J. Driscoll, Jr. and others that the Group Insurance Commission and the Office of Medicaid be authorized to enter into agreements with manufacturer of drugs for purchase of prescribed pharmaceuticals. Health Care Financing.
Title
Regarding Massachusetts drug price relief
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1152 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2193 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1522 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S583 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S563 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2193 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1522 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S583 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S563 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1148 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1148.pdf |