MA H1194 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing access to health care services for all residents through a single payer Medicare for all health care financing system. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing Medicare for all in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H1084 (Similar To) 2019-10-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H1101 (Similar To) 2019-10-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S683 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback