MA H1210 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing notices of the total outstanding or pending loan obligations for University of Massachusetts students. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to student debt
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5209 |
2020-11-25 | House | House concurred |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H43 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S767 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S737 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
S1563 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1564 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5209 (Replaced by) 2020-12-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S767 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S737 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
S1563 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1564 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5209 (Replaced by) 2020-12-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1210 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1210.pdf |