MA H1224 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to financial literacy counseling for students accepted at public institutions of higher education. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to higher education financial literacy counseling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5125 |
2019-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S768 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H5125 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S768 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H5125 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1224 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1224.pdf |