MA H1231 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5209
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to strengthening and expanding affordable, quality higher education opportunities. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to strengthening and expanding affordable, quality higher education opportunities for residents of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5209 |
2020-11-25 | House | House concurred |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S768 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
H5209 (Replaced by) 2020-12-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S768 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
H5209 (Replaced by) 2020-12-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1231 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1231.pdf |