MA H1265 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to emergency housing assistance for certain eligible families. Housing.
Title
To protect families experiencing homelessness from having to sleep in unsafe places
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1275 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
H3066 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H103 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4374
S67 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2667
H3066 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H103 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4374
S67 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2667
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1265 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1265.pdf |