MA H1354 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement options for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to certain option B and option C retirees
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1001 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1345 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1658 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1001 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1345 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1658 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1354 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1354.pdf |