MA H1396 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4924
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4924
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4924
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to proceedings to petitions to remove guardians of minor children. The Judiciary.
Title
To promote the well-being of minor children living with guardians
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | House | New draft substituted, see H4924 |
2020-07-31 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2020-07-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4924 |
2020-02-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1503 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1434 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1415 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H160 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1420 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3390 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4924 (Replaced by) 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2020
H1434 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1415 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H160 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1420 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3390 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4924 (Replaced by) 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1396 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1396.pdf |